RI H5438 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that health insurance contributions made by enrollees for cost sharing requirements include those amounts paid by the enrollee or another person on behalf of the enrollee.
Title
Prescription Drug Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2021) |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5438.pdf |