RI H5437 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows 288 hours of trade school training to qualify for the journeyperson "B" electrical exam. Increases the period of indentured apprenticeship with the department of labor and training and a licensed electrician master to 4 years.
Title
Electricians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2021) |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |