RI H5425 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the council of elementary and secondary education take into consideration the time and cost of transporting students across municipal boundaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Council On Elementary And Secondary Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2019)
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback