RI H5410 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits cities and towns from performing spot assessments that increase the assessment value of properties that have sold, except in accordance with their revaluation or update schedule.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-10 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2021-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-19 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2021) |
2021-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |