RI H5395 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for a tax credit of up to $1,000 for any nurse practitioner, physician assistant or physician who provides on-site clinical education as a clinical preceptor to nurse practitioner graduate students.
Title
Clinical Preceptors Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2023) |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5395.pdf |