RI H5394 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Precludes a parent's disability from serving as the sole basis for the state to institute an investigation of the disabled parent's family.
Title
Preservation Of Families With Disabled Parent Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-05-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/18/2021) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-04-15 | House | House read and passed |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/15/2021) |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/13/2021) |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |