RI H5382 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits more than two (2) members of the state police to be from the same family whether by blood, adoption or marriage.
Title
State Police
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] |
Rep. David Morales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5382.pdf |