RI H5374 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits clinical laboratories to conduct its own analysis of specimens for the detection of HIV/AIDS instead of sending the specimens to the department of health.
Title
Prevention And Suppression Of Contagious Diseases -- Hiv/aids
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2021-06-10 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2021) |
2021-06-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2021) |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |