RI H5357 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that all interconnection and standby transformer costs are to be socialized by National Grid throughout the state of Rhode Island, retroactive to June 15, 2010.
Title
Long-term Contracting Standard For Renewable Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5357.pdf |