RI H5353 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Nathan Bruno and Jason Flatt Act" which requires training of teachers/students/school personnel regarding suicide awareness and prevention, and the establishment of a conflict resolution process between teachers or school personnel/students.
Title
Suicide Prevention--the Nathan Bruno And Jason Flatt Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2021-06-16 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2021) |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2021) |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/03/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |