RI H5347 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides greater details to be considered when deciding if there has been substantial compliance with the statutes requiring the prompt processing and payment of health insurance claims.
Title
Prompt Processing Of Claims
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2019-03-19 | House | Meeting postponed (03/20/2019) |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5347.pdf |