RI H5347 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an eighty percent (80%) school attendance rate for children in families receiving cash and medical assistance from the state as a condition of eligibility.
Title
Rhode Island Works Program-- Compulsory Attendance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2015) |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5347.pdf |