RI H5341 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the timeframe within which to bring an action for an unlawful employment practice.
Title
Fair Employment Practices
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | House read and passed |
2019-03-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |