RI H5340 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-19 - Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-19 - Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effects Of Enacting A Line Item Veto, Potential Rhode Island Constitutional Amendments For A Governor Runoff, And Requirements For The Election Of The Governor (creates A 12 Member Commission To Study Enacting A Line Item Veto, Rhode Island Constitutional Amendments For A Governor Runoff, The Election Of The Governor And Report By April 5, 2018, And Expire On May 7, 2018.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effects Of Enacting A Line Item Veto, Potential Rhode Island Constitutional Amendments For A Governor Runoff, And Requirements For The Election Of The Governor (creates A 12 Member Commission To Study Enacting A Line Item Veto, Rhode Island Constitutional Amendments For A Governor Runoff, The Election Of The Governor And Report By April 5, 2018, And Expire On May 7, 2018.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight |
2017-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-06-06 | House | Meeting postponed (06/06/2017) |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2017) |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |