RI H5338 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state to pay to employees of employers that hire persons with developmental disabilities, no less than $13.77 per hour commencing July 1, 2019 and $15.00 per hour commencing on July 1, 2020.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. John Lyle [R] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5338.pdf |