RI H5315 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the minimum wage for tipped workers by fifty cents ($.50) per year commencing on January 1, 2018 until the tipped minimum wage is not less than two-thirds (2/3) of the regular minimum wage.
Title
Minimum Wage--gratuities
Sponsors
Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017) |
2017-02-08 | House | Meeting postponed (02/09/2017) |
2017-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5315.pdf |