RI H5280 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a refundable ten cent ($0.10) deposit for non-reusable beverage containers. A four cents ($0.04) handling fee would be paid by distributors.
Title
Beverage Container Deposit Recycling Act Of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5280.pdf |