RI H5278 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes licensed advanced practice registered nurses (APRN), certified in psychiatric/mental health, as qualified to certify the need for mental health treatment in certain patients.
Title
Mental Health Law
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2017) |
2017-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5278.pdf |