RI H5262 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the town of Bristol to appoint a second auxiliary member to its historical district commission.
Title
Historical Area Zoning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-05-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/09/2023) |
2023-05-04 | House | House read and passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/04/2023) |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-04-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2023) |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/16/2023) |
2023-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |