RI H5261 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds and makes correctional offices to the definition of "police officer" for the purpose of payment to their salary during line of duty illness or injury.
Title
Relief Of Injured And Deceased Fire Fighters And Public Officers
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2019) |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5261.pdf |