RI H5260 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds police, firefighters and emergency medical technicians to the class of protected people included in the hate crimes sentencing act.
Title
Sentence And Execution
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2017) |
2017-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5260.pdf |