RI H5259 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a voluntary mechanism for municipalities to use to dedicate a park, conservation or other land they own as public trust land in perpetuity to protect and preserve its future use.
Title
Relating To Towns And Cities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-19 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2021) |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |