RI H5254 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-28 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-28 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes administrator DMV to issue special license plates to Friends of Pomham Rocks Lighthouse.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-22 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2021) |
2021-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |