RI H5238 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEE TITLE 16 CHAPTER 97 - THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Creates the "Rhode Island Student Success Act" which would identify those students who are exempt from paying nonresident tuition at public universities, colleges or community colleges.
Title
Council On Postsecondary Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 8 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 8 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee heard |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2021-06-16 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2021) |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |