RI H5197 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires only certified nurse-teachers to be employed as school nurses in elementary and secondary schools.
Title
Certified Nurse-teacher
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-10 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021) |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee transferred to House Education |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |