RI H5196 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a defendant's qualification for the services of public defender constitutes prima facie evidence of indigency and limited ability to pay court costs and no costs shall be ordered unless procedures for determining ability to pay are followed.
Title
Costs
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2019) |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5196.pdf |