RI H5196 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the marking of all underground utility facilities when the underground utility is under a public right-of-way.
Title
Excavation Near Underground Utility Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-05-31 | House | House read and passed |
2017-05-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2017) |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |