RI H5194 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a city or town to electronically notify the division of motor vehicles immediately upon receiving payment of personal property, and/or excise taxes on motor vehicles.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2017) |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5194.pdf |