RI H5187 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all agencies' final rules, promulgated pursuant to the administrative procedures act, be approved by general assembly action, but in no case later than December 31 of the year it is promulgated before it can become effective.
Title
Administrative Procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2023) |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/15/2023) |
2023-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5187.pdf |