RI H5176 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/14/2019)
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides protections to residents of this state furloughed by the federal government relating to civil proceedings, credit card transactions, payments relating to mortgages, leases and installment contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"the Federal Furloughed Employees Protection Act"

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (03/14/2019)
2019-03-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced, referred to House Special Legislation

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback