RI H5157 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds urns and shrouds, prayer cards and other items customarily sold or provided by a funeral director to those funeral items which are already exempt from sales and use taxes.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes--liability And Computation
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2019) |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5157.pdf |