RI H5146 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $1,000,000 To The Rhode Island Council For The Humanities For Direct Grant Funding To Community Cultural Organizations Throughout Rhode Island (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $1,000,000 To The Rhode Island Council For The Humanities To Continue Efforts To Support Local Cultural Organizations Throughout The State.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $1,000,000 To The Rhode Island Council For The Humanities For Direct Grant Funding To Community Cultural Organizations Throughout Rhode Island (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $1,000,000 To The Rhode Island Council For The Humanities To Continue Efforts To Support Local Cultural Organizations Throughout The State.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2023) |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5146.pdf |