RI H5126 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminalizes the knowing and intentional failure of a physician, nurse, or other licensed medical person to provide reasonable medical care and treatment to an infant born alive a felony and manslaughter if the infant dies.
Title
Children
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
Rep. David Coughlin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2017) |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5126.pdf |