RI H5125 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the penalties and fines for the various motor vehicle offenses involving leaving the scene of an accident.
Title
Accidents And Accident Reports
Sponsors
Rep. Doreen Costa [R] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Daniel Reilly [R] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2015) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5125.pdf |