RI H5112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows voters, whose provided address is in question, to vote using a provisional ballot and authorize the local board of canvassers to determine the validity of the provided address.
Title
Voter Regulations
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2017) |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5112.pdf |