RI H5102 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/29/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/29/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names the I-195 Providence River Bridge the "William D. Warner Memorial Bridge."
Title
Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices, And Other State Constructions
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/29/2015) |
2015-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5102.pdf |