RI H5097 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the existing minimum wage of ten dollars and fifty cents ($10.50) to eleven dollars and fifty cents ($11.50) on January 1, 2020, and then increase to twelve dollars and fifty cents ($12.50) on January 1, 2021.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5097.pdf |