RI H5096 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Entitles criminal defendants charged with enumerated serious criminal offenses to a bail hearing within four (4) calendar days of initial court appearance.
Title
Bail Hearings
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2017) |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5096.pdf |