RI H5081 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for establishment of the rare disease medication reinsurance program to be funded by insurer contributions that would be administered by the secretary of health and human services based on recommendations from a 15 member advisory council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing The Rhode Island Rare Disease Medication Accessibility, Affordability, And Reinsurance Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-02-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2021)
2021-02-05HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (02/09/2021)
2021-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2021-02-02HouseCommittee transferred to House Health & Human Services
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback