RI H5076 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the principal at each school to provide an annual report on the number of graduating students and the number applying for admission to college or vocational training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Accountability Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-01-29HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2021)
2021-01-29HouseCommittee transferred to House Education
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback