RI H5068 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- Health And Safety Of Pupils (would Require All School Buildings To Have A Guard On Duty, As Selected By The Appropriate School Committee)
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- Health And Safety Of Pupils (would Require All School Buildings To Have A Guard On Duty, As Selected By The Appropriate School Committee)
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] | Rep. Thomas Palangio [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Committee heard and continued |
2013-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2013) |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5068.pdf |