RI H5054 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the joint committee of the repealer in the general assembly.
Title
Joint Committee Of The Repealer
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-01-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/20/2015) |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5054.pdf |