RI H5050 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows John Austin Murphy to join Ellen Marie Hermann and Stephen DeVoe, III, in marriage on or about July 4, 2015, within the Town of Jamestown, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-12 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2015-03-10 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/12/2015) |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2015-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2015) |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/03/2015) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2015) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | House | House read and passed |
2015-01-20 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (02/03/2015) |
2015-01-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-01-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/20/2015) |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |