RI H5048 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits residential rent increases to ten percent (10%) plus the increase in the Consumer Price Index (CPI) annually.
Title
Residential Landlord And Tenant Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Edward Cardillo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2023) |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5048.pdf |