PA SR6 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution establishing a special bipartisan, bicameral legislative commission to recommend improvements to the delivery of emergency services in this Commonwealth and develop and promote legislation in furtherance of its recommendations.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution establishing a special bipartisan, bicameral legislative commission to recommend improvements to the delivery of emergency services in this Commonwealth and develop and promote legislation in furtherance of its recommendations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 6 PN 569, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Floor: SR 6 PN 569, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00396 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A00396 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 6 PN 160 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Floor: SR 6 PN 569, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00396 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A00396 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 6 PN 160 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2017-04-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Adopted (190-0) |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2017-01-31 | House | In the House |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Adopted (48-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |