PA SR215 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on November 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-24 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on November 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-24 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to complete a comprehensive review and study of the best practices used by private businesses and other public entities in the leasing, acquisition and management of office, warehouse and other types of space and to issue a report.
Title
Directing the Joint State Government Commission to complete a comprehensive review and study of the best practices used by private businesses and other public entities in the leasing, acquisition and management of office, warehouse and other types of space and to issue a report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-24 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2015-11-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |