PA SB99 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 2 (Administrative Law and Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, consolidating provisions on administrative procedure and rulemaking; and making related repeals.
Title
Consolidating provisions on administrative procedure and rulemaking; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - Senate - SB 99 PN 366, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2013-03-18 | House | In the House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |