PA SB99 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-03-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 2 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-03-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 23, 1982 (P.L.597, No.170), known as the Wild Resource Conservation Act, further providing for limitation on General Fund money.
Title
An Act amending the act of June 23, 1982 (P.L.597, No.170), known as the Wild Resource Conservation Act, further providing for limitation on General Fund money.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Jim Ferlo [D] | Sen. Raphael Musto [D] |
Sen. Michael O'Pake [D] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. James Rhoades [R] | Sen. Barry Stout [D] |
Sen. Mary White [R] | Sen. John Wozniak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-03-14 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-03-13 | First consideration | |
2007-03-13 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-02 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=99 |