PA SB954 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for emergency permits at approved private schools and chartered schools for the deaf and blind.
Title
Providing for emergency permits at approved private schools and chartered schools for the deaf and blind.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-14 - Senate - SB 954 PN 1205, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2010-06-14 | In the House | |
2010-06-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-07 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-03 | Laid on the table | |
2009-07-28 | Second consideration | |
2009-07-14 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-23 | First consideration | |
2009-06-23 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to EDUCATION |