PA SB936 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 7 (Banks and Banking) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in mortgage loan industry licensing and consumer protection, further providing for scope, for definitions, for license requirements, for exceptions to license requirements, for general requirements, for powers of licensees in mortgage loan business, for mortgage lending authority and for license applications; providing for prelicensing and continuing education; further providing for license fees, for license issuance, for licensee requirements, for administration and for sanctions; and providing for procedure for determination of noncompliance with Federal law.
Title
In mortgage loan industry licensing and consumer protection, further providing for scope, for definitions, for license requirements, for exceptions to license requirements, for general requirements, for powers of licensees in mortgage loan business, for mortgage lending authority and for license applications; providing for prelicensing and continuing education; further providing for license fees, for license issuance, for licensee requirements, for administration and for sanctions; and providing for procedure for determination of noncompliance with Federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-01 - Senate - SB 936 PN 1241, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-13 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-13 | Removed from table | |
2009-07-08 | Laid on the table | |
2009-07-08 | First consideration | |
2009-07-08 | Reported as amended | |
2009-07-03 | Referred to COMMERCE | |
2009-07-01 | In the House | |
2009-07-01 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-30 | Amended on third consideration | |
2009-06-25 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-24 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-06-16 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-05 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |